This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2023 at 15:09:33 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. VS SEAN A TRUJILLO

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SEAN A TRUJILLO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4938

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC.

Defendant

TRUJILLO SEAN A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GIN MARY

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/23/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

2/23/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/23/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/23/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

2/23/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service [S Laurel Park Rd, Spc 410, Compton, CA]

3/1/2023: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service [S Laurel Park Rd, Spc 410, Compton, CA]

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service [S Laurel Park Rd, Spc 174, Compton, CA]

3/6/2023: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service [S Laurel Park Rd, Spc 174, Compton, CA]

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

3/24/2023: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/29/2024
  • Hearing02/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department Y at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Onemain Financial Group, LLC Successor By Merger To Onemain Financial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Declaration of Non-Service [S Laurel Park Rd, Compton, CA]: Name Extension changed from of Non-Service [S Laurel Park Rd, Compton] to of Non-Service [S Laurel Park Rd, Compton, CA] ; As To Parties: Sean A Trujillo (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Declaration of Non-Service [S Laurel Park Rd, Spc 410, Compton, CA]: Name Extension changed from of Non-Service [S Laurel Park Rd, Compton, CA] to of Non-Service [S Laurel Park Rd, Spc 410, Compton, CA] ; As To Parties: Sean A Trujillo (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Declaration of Non-Service [S Laurel Park Rd, Spc 174, Compton, CA]: Name Extension changed from of Non-Service [S Laurel Park Rd, Compton, CA] to of Non-Service [S Laurel Park Rd, Spc 174, Compton, CA] ; As To Parties: Sean A Trujillo (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service [S Laurel Park Rd, Compton, CA]; Filed by: Onemain Financial Group, LLC Successor By Merger To Onemain Financial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Declaration of Non-Service [S Laurel Park Rd, Compton, CA]: As To Parties: Sean A Trujillo (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Declaration of Non-Service [S Laurel Park Rd, Compton]: As To Parties: Sean A Trujillo (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service [S Laurel Park Rd, Compton]; Filed by: Onemain Financial Group, LLC Successor By Merger To Onemain Financial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs in Department Y Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Onemain Financial Group, LLC Successor By Merger To Onemain Financial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Sean A Trujillo (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Onemain Financial Group, LLC Successor By Merger To Onemain Financial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Sean A Trujillo (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Onemain Financial Group, LLC Successor By Merger To Onemain Financial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Sean A Trujillo (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less