Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/02/2021 at 08:29:50 (UTC).

OLD REPULBIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION VS SOLAR SPECTRUM, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 OLD REPULBIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SOLAR SPECTRUM, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1038

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLD REPULBIC SURETY COMPANY A CORPORATION

Defendants

KAECH SUSAN

LICHTBLAU ERICH

JONES JANET

SOLAR SPECTRUM LLC DBA SUNGEVITY

GARCIA LEAH

HARDY ANDREW

HAN DELPHINE D.

HUEHNERFUSS GARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PAGAN JOHN M.

PAGAN JOHN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/21/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Affidavit (name extension) - Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence

4/6/2021: Affidavit (name extension) - Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence

Affidavit (name extension) - Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence

3/17/2021: Affidavit (name extension) - Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

2/25/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

2/25/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/8/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/8/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

2/8/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Old Repulbic Surety Company, a corporation on 02/08/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Old Repulbic Surety Company, a corporation as to Solar Spectrum, LLC, Leah Garcia, Janet Jones, Andrew Hardy, Gary Huehnerfuss, Erich Lichtblau, Susan Kaech, and Delphine D. Han

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketAffidavit of Reasonable Diligence; Filed by: Old Repulbic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketAffidavit of Reasonable Diligence; Filed by: Old Repulbic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- John Pagan (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Law Offices of Hausman & Sosa, LLP to Hausman & Sosa, LLP; Middle Name: blank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Old Repulbic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Andrew Hardy (Defendant); Service Date: 02/17/2021; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Old Repulbic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Janet Jones (Defendant); Mailing Date: 02/16/2021; Service Cost: 65.00; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Old Repulbic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Leah Garcia (Defendant); Mailing Date: 02/16/2021; Service Cost: 75.00; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Old Repulbic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Solar Spectrum, LLC (Defendant); Leah Garcia (Defendant); Janet Jones (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Old Repulbic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Solar Spectrum, LLC (Defendant); Leah Garcia (Defendant); Janet Jones (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Old Repulbic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Solar Spectrum, LLC (Defendant); Leah Garcia (Defendant); Janet Jones (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOLAR SPECTRUM LLC DBA SUNGEVITY is a litigant

Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAGAN JOHN