This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/05/2021 at 10:57:24 (UTC).

OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION VS VIBE SOLAR, A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VIBE SOLAR, A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6815

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY A CORPORATION

Defendants

VIBE SOLAR A CORPORATION

MIKAELIAN ADAM

MILAELIAN SARIN

WILLIAMS DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAGAN JOHN M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

9/20/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

9/20/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

9/20/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/20/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

9/20/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

10/26/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2024
  • Hearing09/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • Hearing03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Old Republic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Williams (Defendant); Service Date: 09/29/2021; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Old Republic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Sarin Milaelian (Defendant); Mailing Date: 09/30/2021; Service Cost: 75.00; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Old Republic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Adam Mikaelian (Defendant); Service Date: 09/29/2021; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Old Republic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Vibe Solar, a corporation (Defendant); Adam Mikaelian (Defendant); Sarin Milaelian (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Old Republic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Vibe Solar, a corporation (Defendant); Adam Mikaelian (Defendant); Sarin Milaelian (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Old Republic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Vibe Solar, a corporation (Defendant); Adam Mikaelian (Defendant); Sarin Milaelian (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAGAN JOHN