This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 17:14:37 (UTC).

OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION VS PATRIOT POOL BUILDERS, INC., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PATRIOT POOL BUILDERS, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6424

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY A CORPORATION

Defendants

PATRIOT POOL BUILDERS INC. A CORPORATION

BUTALIA INDERPAL

BUTALIA ANNIE

AGARPAO MILA

AGARPAO ANGELITO

ESPARZA LUCY

ESPARZA FERNANDO

MANAHAN ENCARNACION

SORROW NICOLE

MANAHAN JOEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAGAN JOHN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

10/26/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

10/26/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

10/26/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

10/26/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

10/26/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

10/26/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

11/2/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

11/2/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings - Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

9/28/2021: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings - Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

9/16/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/16/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

9/16/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

9/20/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer - Answer

9/24/2021: Answer - Answer

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

9/2/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2024
  • Hearing09/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • Hearing03/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Old Republic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Inderpal Butalia (Defendant); Service Date: 09/16/2021; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Old Republic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Joel Manahan (Defendant); Service Date: 09/23/2021; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Old Republic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Annie Butalia (Defendant); Mailing Date: 09/16/2021; Service Cost: 65.00; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Old Republic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Nicole Sorrow (Defendant); Service Date: 09/20/2021; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Old Republic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Encarnacion Manahan (Defendant); Mailing Date: 09/23/2021; Service Cost: 55.00; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Old Republic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Patriot Pool Builders, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Mailing Date: 09/10/2021; Service Cost: 65.00; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Old Republic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Lucy Esparza (Defendant); Mailing Date: 09/10/2021; Service Cost: 65.00; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Old Republic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Angelito Agarpao (Defendant); Mailing Date: 09/10/2021; Service Cost: 65.00; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Old Republic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Patriot Pool Builders, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Inderpal Butalia (Defendant); Annie Butalia (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Old Republic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Patriot Pool Builders, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Inderpal Butalia (Defendant); Annie Butalia (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Old Republic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Patriot Pool Builders, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Inderpal Butalia (Defendant); Annie Butalia (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAGAN JOHN