This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 17:36:01 (UTC).

OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION VS GOLD COAST POOL CONSTRUCTION CORP., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GOLD COAST POOL CONSTRUCTION CORP , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7412

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY A CORPORATION

Defendants

GOLD COAST POOL CONSTRUCTION CORP. A CORPORATION

CLARK EDWARD

CLARK MARINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOSA CARLOS

Defendant Attorney

GETZELS MORRIS STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

10/12/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

10/12/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/12/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint in Interpleader - Complaint in Interpleader

10/12/2021: Complaint in Interpleader - Complaint in Interpleader

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

10/12/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

10/29/2021: Answer - Answer

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation for Order of Distribution of Old Republic Surety Company Contractor's Bonds (Deposited in Court)

11/22/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation for Order of Distribution of Old Republic Surety Company Contractor's Bonds (Deposited in Court)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2024
  • Hearing10/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • Hearing04/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation for Order of Distribution of Old Republic Surety Company Contractor's Bonds (Deposited in Court): Status Date changed from 11/22/2021 to 11/22/2021; As To Parties changed from OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff) to OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order Stipulation for Order of Distribution of Old Republic Surety Company Contractor's Bonds (Deposited in Court); Filed by: EDWARD CLARK (Defendant); MARINA CLARK (Defendant); As to: OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: EDWARD CLARK (Defendant); Service Date: 10/26/2021; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: GOLD COAST POOL CONSTRUCTION CORP., a corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 10/25/2021; Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: EDWARD CLARK (Defendant); MARINA CLARK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint in Interpleader; Filed by: OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: GOLD COAST POOL CONSTRUCTION CORP., a corporation (Defendant); EDWARD CLARK (Defendant); MARINA CLARK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: GOLD COAST POOL CONSTRUCTION CORP., a corporation (Defendant); EDWARD CLARK (Defendant); MARINA CLARK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: GOLD COAST POOL CONSTRUCTION CORP., a corporation (Defendant); EDWARD CLARK (Defendant); MARINA CLARK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GETZELS MORRIS S.