This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2022 at 07:46:01 (UTC).

ODELY CISNEROS VS SIMPLIFIED LABOR STAFFING SOLUTIONS, INC. (A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION), ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/04/2022 ODELY CISNEROS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SIMPLIFIED LABOR STAFFING SOLUTIONS, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0751

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CISNEROS ODELY

Defendants

SIMPLIFIED LABOR STAFFING SOLUTIONS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DAMCO USA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

DAMCO DISTRIBUTION SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MERLUZA RICARDO YUAGA

Defendant Attorney

AL-CHALATI-MOELLER DANIELLE

 

Court Documents

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

2/4/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/4/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

2/4/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/4/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/4/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

2/4/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

2/4/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Motion to Compel Arbitration - Motion to Compel Arbitration

4/14/2022: Motion to Compel Arbitration - Motion to Compel Arbitration

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/30/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer - Answer

3/28/2022: Answer - Answer

Answer - Answer

5/16/2022: Answer - Answer

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

7/12/2022: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

7/8/2022: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/26/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

9/26/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/26/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Odely Cisneros on 02/04/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Odely Cisneros as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Odely Cisneros (Plaintiff); As to: Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions, Inc. (a California corporation) (Defendant); DAMCO USA, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) (Defendant); DAMCO DISTRIBUTION SERVICES INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/26/2022 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 09/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal Filed Not Entered: Name Extension: Filed Not Entered; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:2730733 resulted in empty message

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:2730734 resulted in empty message

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:2730735 resulted in empty message

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Odely Cisneros on 02/04/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Odely Cisneros

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Odely Cisneros (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Odely Cisneros (Plaintiff); As to: Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions, Inc. (a California corporation) (Defendant); DAMCO USA, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Odely Cisneros (Plaintiff); As to: Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions, Inc. (a California corporation) (Defendant); DAMCO USA, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Odely Cisneros (Plaintiff); As to: Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions, Inc. (a California corporation) (Defendant); DAMCO USA, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/07/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAMCO USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SIMPLIFIED LABOR STAFFING SOLUTIONS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AL-CHALATI-MOELLER DANIELLE