This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/16/2021 at 06:14:47 (UTC).

NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE, INC. VS ELIAHU SHOEF

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ELIAHU SHOEF. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2682

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE INC.

Defendant

SHOEF ELIAHU AKA ELI SHOEF AS AN INDIVIDUAL DBA CREATIVE BUILT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRIBB STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/13/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/13/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

9/13/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

10/18/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

10/14/2021: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

Answer - Answer

10/14/2021: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • Hearing09/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE, INC. (Plaintiff); After Substituted Service of Summons & Complaint ?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 09/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: ELIAHU SHOEF (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: ELIAHU SHOEF (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: ELIAHU SHOEF (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: ELIAHU SHOEF (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE INC. is a litigant