This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 13:16:03 (UTC).

NORMAN S. WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS PACIFIC MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS, INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 NORMAN S WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PACIFIC MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS, INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4083

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORMAN S. WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

PRECISION RUN LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

PACIFIC MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLUM HOWARD S

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

5/26/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/26/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

5/26/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/30/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by NORMAN S. WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LLC, a California Limited Liability Company on 05/26/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by NORMAN S. WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LLC, a California Limited Liability Company as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: NORMAN S. WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: PRECISION RUN, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Service Date: 06/10/2021; Service Cost: 375.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: NORMAN S. WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: PACIFIC MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS, INC, a California corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 06/03/2021; Service Cost: 110.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: NORMAN S. WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: PACIFIC MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS, INC, a California corporation (Defendant); PRECISION RUN, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: NORMAN S. WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: PACIFIC MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS, INC, a California corporation (Defendant); PRECISION RUN, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: NORMAN S. WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: PACIFIC MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS, INC, a California corporation (Defendant); PRECISION RUN, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NORMAN S. WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLUM HOWARD S.