This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/25/2022 at 02:22:43 (UTC).

NORMA LOPEZ VS QUIET CANNON MONTEBELLO, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 NORMA LOPEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against QUIET CANNON MONTEBELLO, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EMMA CASTRO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0605

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

EMMA CASTRO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOPEZ NORMA

Defendant

QUIET CANNON MONTEBELLO INC.

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/19/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/19/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/26/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

3/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/15/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Norma Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Norma Lopez on 02/19/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Norma Lopez as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/07/2021 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Norma Lopez (Plaintiff); Quiet Cannon Montebello, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Norma Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: Quiet Cannon Montebello, Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 02/25/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Norma Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: Quiet Cannon Montebello, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Norma Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Norma Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Emma Castro in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/07/2021 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Quiet Cannon Montebello, Inc. (Defendant) to Quiet Cannon Montebello, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer ? Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Norma Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Norma Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer ? Small Claims: As To Parties changed from Norma Lopez (Plaintiff) to Norma Lopez (Plaintiff); Status changed from Filed to Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUIET CANNON MONTEBELLO INC is a litigant