This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/02/2022 at 00:11:30 (UTC).

NORGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY VS LAURENCE SPENCER-SMITH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 NORGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LAURENCE SPENCER-SMITH,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6084

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

SPENCER-SMITH LAURENCE

SPENCER-SMITH MARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEACH BRIAN E

 

Court Documents

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

9/19/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

9/19/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

9/19/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/19/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

9/19/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

10/26/2022: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/21/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/22/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Norguard Insurance Company on 09/19/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Norguard Insurance Company as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Norguard Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Norguard Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Laurence Spencer-Smith (Defendant); Mary Spencer-Smith (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/22/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Norguard Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Laurence Spencer-Smith (Defendant); Mary Spencer-Smith (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Norguard Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Laurence Spencer-Smith (Defendant); Mary Spencer-Smith (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Norguard Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Laurence Spencer-Smith (Defendant); Mary Spencer-Smith (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEACH BRIAN E