This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2021 at 19:05:29 (UTC).

NOEL BELZA MENDOZA VS SOUTHGATE AUTO, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 NOEL BELZA MENDOZA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SOUTHGATE AUTO, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3641

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MENDOZA NOEL BELZA

Defendants

SOUTHGATE AUTO INC. DBA EXPRESS AUTO LENDING A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SADR KASRA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/11/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

5/11/2021: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

5/11/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/11/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/15/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

6/15/2021: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/1/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/1/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/16/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/15/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2024
  • Hearing05/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • Hearing11/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Noel Belza Mendoza (Plaintiff); As to: Westlake Services, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Westlake Services, LLC; On the Complaint filed by Noel Belza Mendoza on 05/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Noel Belza Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Noel Belza Mendoza on 05/11/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Noel Belza Mendoza as to SOUTHGATE AUTO, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Noel Belza Mendoza (Plaintiff); As to: Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant); Service Date: 05/20/2021; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Noel Belza Mendoza (Plaintiff); As to: SOUTHGATE AUTO, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Noel Belza Mendoza on 05/11/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Noel Belza Mendoza as to Hudson Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Noel Belza Mendoza (Plaintiff); As to: Westlake Services, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 05/20/2021; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Noel Belza Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Noel Belza Mendoza (Plaintiff); As to: SOUTHGATE AUTO, INC. (Defendant); Westlake Services, LLC (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Noel Belza Mendoza (Plaintiff); As to: SOUTHGATE AUTO, INC. (Defendant); Westlake Services, LLC (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHGATE AUTO INC. DBA EXPRESS AUTO LENDING is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SADR KASRA