This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/08/2022 at 15:14:08 (UTC).

NICOLE MURTHA VS PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AGENCY

Case Summary

On 01/28/2022 NICOLE MURTHA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AGENCY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0130

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MURTHA NICOLE

Defendant

PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AGENCY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

1/28/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/28/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

1/28/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/5/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/05/2022

4/5/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/05/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Nicole Murtha on 01/28/2022, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/05/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/05/2022 at 10:00 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 updated: Result Date to 04/05/2022; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/05/2022 at 10:00 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Nicole Murtha (Plaintiff); As to: Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F44 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AGENCY is a litigant