This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2023 at 01:25:47 (UTC).

NICHOLAS CHARLES SMITH VS BLACK AND WHITE GARAGE INC

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 NICHOLAS CHARLES SMITH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BLACK AND WHITE GARAGE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2011

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH NICHOLAS CHARLES

Defendant

BLACK AND WHITE GARAGE INC

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/27/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/27/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

9/27/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

9/27/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/11/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/07/2022

11/7/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/07/2022

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/7/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/7/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: BLACK AND WHITE GARAGE INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/07/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by NICHOLAS CHARLES SMITH on 09/27/2022, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/07/2022 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: NICHOLAS CHARLES SMITH (Plaintiff); As to: BLACK AND WHITE GARAGE INC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/04/2022; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: NICHOLAS CHARLES SMITH (Plaintiff); As to: BLACK AND WHITE TOWING (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from BLACK AND WHITE TOWING (Defendant) to BLACK AND WHITE GARAGE INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from BLACK AND WHITE TOWING (Defendant) to BLACK AND WHITE GARAGE INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from BLACK AND WHITE TOWING (Defendant) to BLACK AND WHITE GARAGE INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- BLACK AND WHITE GARAGE INC (Defendant): Organization Name changed from BLACK AND WHITE TOWING to BLACK AND WHITE GARAGE INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • Docket** Case Name changed from NICHOLAS CHARLES SMITH vs BLACK AND WHITE TOWING to NICHOLAS CHARLES SMITH vs BLACK AND WHITE GARAGE INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: NICHOLAS CHARLES SMITH (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: NICHOLAS CHARLES SMITH (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/07/2022 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result Date changed from 09/27/2022 to 09/27/2022; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from BLACK AND WHITE TOWING (Defendant) to BLACK AND WHITE GARAGE INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less