This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/25/2022 at 13:25:32 (UTC).

NICHOLAS AMORELLI VS UHAUL

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 NICHOLAS AMORELLI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UHAUL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD F. FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0345

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMORELLI NICHOLAS

Defendant

UHAUL

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION MEET AND CONFER/NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCES, EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL, Plaintiff's Claim

3/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION MEET AND CONFER/NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCES, EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL, Plaintiff's Claim

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/15/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/22/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/22/2021

6/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/22/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/22/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by NICHOLAS AMORELLI on 03/15/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 06/22/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION MEET AND CONFER/NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCES, EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION MEET AND CONFER/NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCES, EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: NICHOLAS AMORELLI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: NICHOLAS AMORELLI (Plaintiff); As to: UHAUL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UHAUL is a litigant