This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/05/2021 at 07:51:23 (UTC).

NAZIK BLKHOYAN VS COOPER TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 NAZIK BLKHOYAN filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against COOPER TIRE RUBBER COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2903

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLKHOYAN NAZIK

Defendant

COOPER TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAHBAZ JACOB A

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/28/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/29/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/12/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/12/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

4/12/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/12/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by NAZIK BLKHOYAN on 04/12/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by NAZIK BLKHOYAN as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: NAZIK BLKHOYAN (Plaintiff); As to: COOPER TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY (Defendant); Service Date: 06/25/2021; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: NAZIK BLKHOYAN (Plaintiff); As to: COOPER TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: NAZIK BLKHOYAN (Plaintiff); As to: COOPER TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: NAZIK BLKHOYAN (Plaintiff); As to: COOPER TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: NAZIK BLKHOYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: NAZIK BLKHOYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cooper Tire & Rubber Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAHBAZ JACOB A