This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/04/2022 at 13:46:12 (UTC).

NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY, A NEW YORK CORPORATION VS 509 CONSTRUCTION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/09/2022 NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY, A NEW YORK CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against 509 CONSTRUCTION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1564

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION

Defendants

ANSTEE ASHLYN

MINCHIO CRISTIANO

OHAN & ASSOCIATES A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

REHABBERS FINANCIAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

STEPHENS PLUMBING & HEATING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CONVERSE-FRAZER RICHARD

MONN ANDREW

UNTITLED LABS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS AS MADE RENOVATION DBA MADE RENOVATION

509 CONSTRUCTION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SKOLNICK JOHN

WILLIAMS GLENDA

HUANG JUSTIN

CHOI DAVID

SMART GATE & GARAGE DOOR SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CIVETTI ANDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOROWITZ JEFFREY

Defendant Attorney

TOM QUINLAN SYDNEY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/9/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

3/9/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/9/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

3/9/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Complaint in Interpleader - Complaint in Interpleader

3/9/2022: Complaint in Interpleader - Complaint in Interpleader

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

3/9/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/9/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Answer - Answer

4/18/2022: Answer - Answer

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Deposit of Interpleader Funds With The Clerk of the Court

3/17/2022: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Deposit of Interpleader Funds With The Clerk of the Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2025
  • Hearing03/12/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • Hearing09/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: JUSTIN HUANG (Defendant); UNTITLED LABS, INC, a California corporation doing business as MADE RENOVATION (Defendant); As to: NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Deposit of Interpleader Funds With The Clerk of the Court; Filed by: NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint in Interpleader; Filed by: NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation (Plaintiff); As to: 509 CONSTRUCTION, a California corporation (Defendant); JOHN SKOLNICK (Defendant); GLENDA WILLIAMS (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation (Plaintiff); As to: 509 CONSTRUCTION, a California corporation (Defendant); JOHN SKOLNICK (Defendant); GLENDA WILLIAMS (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/12/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STEPHANS PLUMBING AND HEATING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where 509 CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where REHABBERS FINANCIAL INC. DBA AZTEC FINANCIAL A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION is a litigant