This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/07/2021 at 07:38:58 (UTC).

NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLC VS DAVID M. STURMAN, APC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DAVID M STURMAN, APC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0703

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONWIDE LEGAL LLC

Defendants

DAVID M. STURMAN APC

STURMAN DAVID MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/30/2021

9/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/30/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

9/30/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

9/30/2021: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

8/12/2021: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

8/12/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/12/2021

8/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/12/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/08/2021, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol and Notice of Online Dispute Resol

7/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/08/2021, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol and Notice of Online Dispute Resol

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/8/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

4/6/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence

4/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/6/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

4/6/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • Hearing11/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/30/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 11/18/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/12/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 08/12/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Nationwide Legal, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: David Michael Sturman (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/15/2021; Service Cost: 39.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Nationwide Legal, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: David M. Sturman, APC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/15/2021; Service Cost: 79.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Nationwide Legal, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: David M. Sturman, APC (Defendant); David Michael Sturman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONWIDE LEGAL LLC is a litigant