This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 21:10:51 (UTC).

NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA VS CAR WASH PARTNERS, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CAR WASH PARTNERS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7471

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Defendant

CAR WASH PARTNERS INC. DBA MISTER CAR WASH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENSON SUSAN M

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

10/15/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

10/15/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/15/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

10/15/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

10/15/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2024
  • Hearing10/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • Hearing04/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Nationwide Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff); As to: Car Wash Partners, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 10/21/2021; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Nationwide Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff); As to: Car Wash Partners, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Nationwide Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff); As to: Car Wash Partners, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Nationwide Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff); As to: Car Wash Partners, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAR WASH PARTNERS INC. DBA MISTER CAR WASH is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationwide Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENSON SUSAN M