This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/10/2021 at 15:13:16 (UTC).

NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS PROSPECT ENTERPRISES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PROSPECT ENTERPRISES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2544

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BLAIR SMITH AND ASSOCIATES

Defendants

PROSPECT ENTERPRISES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BOTH CENTRAL FISH COMPANY AND AMERICAN FISH & SEAFOOD

DOIZAKI JAMES AKA JAMES K. DOIZAKI INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE THE DOIZAKI FAMILY TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BESNYL GLENN ALAN

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

8/31/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/31/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/31/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/31/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

8/31/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/13/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

9/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/27/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc., a California corporation on 08/31/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc., a California corporation as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: National Commercial Recovery, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: James Doizaki (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/10/2021; Service Cost: 25.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: National Commercial Recovery, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Prospect Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 09/10/2021; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: National Commercial Recovery, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Prospect Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); James Doizaki (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: National Commercial Recovery, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Prospect Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); James Doizaki (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: National Commercial Recovery, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Prospect Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); James Doizaki (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROSPECT ENTERPRISE INCORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BLAIR SMITH AND ASSOCIATES is a litigant