This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2023 at 10:04:46 (UTC).

NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2006-3, A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST(S) VS CINTHYA M GUILLEN-MADRIG

Case Summary

On 03/13/2023 NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2006-3, A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST S filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CINTHYA M GUILLEN-MADRIG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6211

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2006-3 A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUSTS

Defendant

GUILLEN-MADRIG CINTHYA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHLICK ALISON K

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/13/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/13/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

3/13/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/13/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/13/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2024
  • Hearing03/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2006-3, a Delaware Statutory Trust(s) (Plaintiff); As to: CINTHYA M GUILLEN-MADRIG (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2006-3, a Delaware Statutory Trust(s) (Plaintiff); As to: CINTHYA M GUILLEN-MADRIG (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2006-3, a Delaware Statutory Trust(s) (Plaintiff); As to: CINTHYA M GUILLEN-MADRIG (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less