This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/13/2023 at 14:15:06 (UTC).

NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2005-2, A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST(S) VS SHANNON C TEAGUE

Case Summary

On 03/13/2023 NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2005-2, A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST S filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHANNON C TEAGUE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NICHOLAS F. DAUM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6217

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

NICHOLAS F. DAUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2005-2 A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUSTS

Defendant

TEAGUE SHANNON C AKA SHANNON GLASER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHLICK ALISON K

Defendant Attorney

ROSE WILLIAM JAY

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/13/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

3/13/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/13/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/13/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/13/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/30/2023: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

4/11/2023: Answer - Answer

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

4/12/2023: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2024
  • Hearing03/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 03/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: SHANNON C TEAGUE (Defendant); As to: NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2005-2, a Delaware Statutory Trust(s) (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2005-2, a Delaware Statutory Trust(s) (Plaintiff); As to: SHANNON C TEAGUE (Defendant); Service Date: 03/25/2023; Service Cost: 89.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Nicholas F. Daum in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2005-2, a Delaware Statutory Trust(s) (Plaintiff); As to: SHANNON C TEAGUE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2005-2, a Delaware Statutory Trust(s) (Plaintiff); As to: SHANNON C TEAGUE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2005-2, a Delaware Statutory Trust(s) (Plaintiff); As to: SHANNON C TEAGUE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less