This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/04/2021 at 04:37:03 (UTC).

NATALYA GLUKHOVSKAYA VS COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 NATALYA GLUKHOVSKAYA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4278

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GLUKHOVSKAYA NATALYA

Defendant

COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA VANESSA

Defendant Attorney

GOBEL SEVAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Natalya Glukhovskaya on 06/04/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Natalya Glukhovskaya as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Costco Wholesale Corporation, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant); As to: Natalya Glukhovskaya (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Natalya Glukhovskaya (Plaintiff); As to: Costco Wholesale Corporation, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Natalya Glukhovskaya (Plaintiff); As to: Costco Wholesale Corporation, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Natalya Glukhovskaya (Plaintiff); As to: Costco Wholesale Corporation, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOBEL SEVAN ESQ.