This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2022 at 15:02:20 (UTC).

NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTER LP VS BLEU FOX GAS COMPANY, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTER LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BLEU FOX GAS COMPANY, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3356

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTER LP

Defendant

BLEU FOX GAS COMPANY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZEFF MICHAEL D.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/17/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

5/17/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

5/17/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Complaint - Complaint

5/17/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/17/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

5/17/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Motion to Reclassify - Motion to Reclassify

5/23/2022: Motion to Reclassify - Motion to Reclassify

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion))

9/6/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion))

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

9/13/2022: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2025
  • Hearing05/20/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2023
  • Hearing11/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTER LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion) scheduled for 09/06/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 09/06/2022; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion) scheduled for 09/06/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketMotion to Reclassify; Filed by: NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTER LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTER LP (Plaintiff); As to: BLEU FOX GAS COMPANY, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTER LP (Plaintiff); As to: BLEU FOX GAS COMPANY, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTER LP (Plaintiff); As to: BLEU FOX GAS COMPANY, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/20/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTER LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEFF MICHAEL D.