This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/01/2022 at 07:08:27 (UTC).

NASCH VILLAGE GREEN LP VS DR. SHARON NORLING

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 NASCH VILLAGE GREEN LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DR SHARON NORLING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3355

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NASCH VILLAGE GREEN LP

Defendant

NORLING DR. SHARON DBA MIND BODY SPIRIT CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZEFF MICHAEL D.

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

5/17/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

5/17/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/17/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/17/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

5/17/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

5/17/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2025
  • Hearing05/20/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2023
  • Hearing11/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: NASCH VILLAGE GREEN LP (Plaintiff); As to: DR. SHARON NORLING (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: NASCH VILLAGE GREEN LP (Plaintiff); As to: DR. SHARON NORLING (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: NASCH VILLAGE GREEN LP (Plaintiff); As to: DR. SHARON NORLING (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/20/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NASCH VILLAGE GREEN LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEFF MICHAEL D.