This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2022 at 19:31:21 (UTC).

NASCH GLENOAKS LLC VS KARINE ARAKELYAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2021 NASCH GLENOAKS LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KARINE ARAKELYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8067

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NASCH GLENOAKS LLC

Defendants

ARAKELYAN KARINE

MATSHKALYAN SUREN

GHASABOGHLYAN GAYANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZEFF MICHAEL D.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

11/9/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

11/9/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/9/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

11/9/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

11/9/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/15/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/15/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/15/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/15/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Judgment - Judgment by Default

3/28/2022: Judgment - Judgment by Default

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

3/3/2022: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/3/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff NASCH GLENOAKS LLC against Defendant KARINE ARAKELYAN, Defendant SUREN MATSHKALYAN and Defendant GAYANE GHASABOGHLYAN on the Complaint filed by NASCH GLENOAKS LLC on 11/09/2021 for damages of $6,922.26, attorney fees of $505.33, and costs of $392.53 for a total of $7,820.12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketJudgment by Default; Signed and Filed by: NASCH GLENOAKS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: KARINE ARAKELYAN (Defendant); SUREN MATSHKALYAN (Defendant); GAYANE GHASABOGHLYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment by Default: As To Parties changed from GAYANE GHASABOGHLYAN (Defendant), KARINE ARAKELYAN (Defendant), SUREN MATSHKALYAN (Defendant) to SUREN MATSHKALYAN (Defendant), KARINE ARAKELYAN (Defendant), GAYANE GHASABOGHLYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/28/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/28/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: NASCH GLENOAKS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: NASCH GLENOAKS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: KARINE ARAKELYAN (Defendant); SUREN MATSHKALYAN (Defendant); GAYANE GHASABOGHLYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: NASCH GLENOAKS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: KARINE ARAKELYAN (Defendant); SUREN MATSHKALYAN (Defendant); GAYANE GHASABOGHLYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: NASCH GLENOAKS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: KARINE ARAKELYAN (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/18/2021; Service Cost: 69.51; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: NASCH GLENOAKS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: GAYANE GHASABOGHLYAN (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/18/2021; Service Cost: 41.51; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: NASCH GLENOAKS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: KARINE ARAKELYAN (Defendant); SUREN MATSHKALYAN (Defendant); GAYANE GHASABOGHLYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: NASCH GLENOAKS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: KARINE ARAKELYAN (Defendant); SUREN MATSHKALYAN (Defendant); GAYANE GHASABOGHLYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: NASCH GLENOAKS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: KARINE ARAKELYAN (Defendant); SUREN MATSHKALYAN (Defendant); GAYANE GHASABOGHLYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEFF MICHAEL D.