This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2022 at 14:43:39 (UTC).

MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC. VS SF MEDIA CONSULTANTS, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SF MEDIA CONSULTANTS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6044

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS INC.

Defendant

SF MEDIA CONSULTANTS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZASLAVSKY NEAL

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

8/16/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

8/16/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

8/16/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

8/16/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/23/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

9/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

9/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/25/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2024
  • Hearing08/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • Hearing02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: SF Media Consultants, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to SF Media Consultants, Inc. On the Complaint filed by Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters, Inc. on 08/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: SF Media Consultants, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 08/25/2021; Service Cost: 250.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: SF Media Consultants, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 08/27/2021; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: SF Media Consultants, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: SF Media Consultants, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: SF Media Consultants, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS INC. is a litigant