This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2023 at 05:32:21 (UTC).

MOHAMMAD MASOUD KAZEMI VS JP MORGAN CHASE & CO.

Case Summary

On 10/04/2022 MOHAMMAD MASOUD KAZEMI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JP MORGAN CHASE CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2080

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAZEMI MOHAMMAD MASOUD

Defendant

J.P. MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICES INC.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

10/4/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

10/4/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

10/18/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

Proof of Service - No Service - Not Found/No Service/Canceled - $35.00

10/18/2022: Proof of Service - No Service - Not Found/No Service/Canceled - $35.00

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) NO PROOF OF MAILING

10/18/2022: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) NO PROOF OF MAILING

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

10/20/2022: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

10/21/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

10/21/2022: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/14/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Mohammad Masoud Kazemi on 10/04/2022, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 12/14/2022; Result Type to Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 12/14/2022 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketOrder on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Mohammad Masoud Kazemi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) NO PROOF OF MAILING: Filed By: Mohammad Masoud Kazemi (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/20/2022; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketAddress for J.P. MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICES INC. (Defendant) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Mohammad Masoud Kazemi (Plaintiff); As to: J.P. MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICES INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) NO PROOF OF MAILING; Filed by: Mohammad Masoud Kazemi (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketNot Found/No Service/Canceled - $35.00; Filed by: Mohammad Masoud Kazemi (Plaintiff); As to: J.P. MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL CORPORATE SERVICES INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Mohammad Masoud Kazemi (Plaintiff); As to: JP Morgan Chase & Co. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less