This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/06/2021 at 04:21:36 (UTC).

MOEIN ASGHARNEJAD TEHRAN VS DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 MOEIN ASGHARNEJAD TEHRAN filed an Infraction - Parking lawsuit against DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4881

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Parking

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Appellant

TEHRAN MOEIN ASGHARNEJAD

Respondents

DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

CITY OF LOS ANGELES PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Parking Appeal Re: Citation 4526671520)

9/3/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Parking Appeal Re: Citation 4526671520)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal]

9/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal]

Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal - Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal

9/3/2021: Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal - Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Administrative File - Request for Administrative File

7/8/2021: Request for Administrative File - Request for Administrative File

Notice of Appeal - Notice of Appeal - Hearing on Parking Appeal

7/8/2021: Notice of Appeal - Notice of Appeal - Hearing on Parking Appeal

Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision - Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision

7/1/2021: Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision - Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/1/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Appeal - Parking - Notice of Appeal - Parking

7/1/2021: Notice of Appeal - Parking - Notice of Appeal - Parking

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Decision - Administrative Appeal; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Parking Appeal Re: Citation 4526671520)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketHearing on Parking Appeal scheduled for 09/03/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 09/03/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Moein Asgharnejad Tehran (Appellant); As to: CITY OF LOS ANGELES PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU (Respondent); Service Date: 08/16/2021; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- CITY OF LOS ANGELES PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU (Respondent): Organization Name changed from Department of Transportation to CITY OF LOS ANGELES PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketHearing on Parking Appeal scheduled for 09/03/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appeal - Hearing on Parking Appeal; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Administrative File; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appeal - Parking - Citation Number: 4526671520; Filed by: Moein Asgharnejad Tehran (Appellant); As to: Department of Transportation (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Moein Asgharnejad Tehran (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Moein Asgharnejad Tehran (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Moein Asgharnejad Tehran (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant