This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/14/2023 at 00:51:25 (UTC).

M&N FINANCING CORPORATION VS PARAMOUNT RECOVERY SERVICES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/18/2022 M N FINANCING CORPORATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PARAMOUNT RECOVERY SERVICES,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4165

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M&N FINANCING CORPORATION

Defendants

CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION OF LICENSED REPOSSESSORS INC.

PARAMOUNT RECOVERY SERVICES INC

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/10/2023: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/16/2023: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/16/2023: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/16/2023

2/16/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/16/2023

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/16/2023: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/16/2023: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/15/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/15/2022

12/15/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/15/2022

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/15/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/15/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

12/8/2022: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Notice of Rejection

12/8/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Notice of Rejection

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

12/1/2022: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/29/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

11/8/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

10/18/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/18/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

10/18/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: M&N Financing Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by M&N Financing Corporation on 10/18/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by M&N Financing Corporation as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: California Association of Licensed Repossessors Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: M&N Financing Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: M&N Financing Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by M&N Financing Corporation on 10/18/2022, entered Order for Dismissal with prejudice as to California Association of Licensed Repossessors Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/16/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Notice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Paramount Recovery Services Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: M&N Financing Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: California Association of Licensed Repossessors Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/07/22; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: M&N Financing Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Paramount Recovery Services (Defendant); Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/19/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Paramount Recovery Services Inc (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Paramount Recovery Services to Paramount Recovery Services Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: M&N Financing Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Paramount Recovery Services (Defendant); California Association of Licensed Repossessors Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less