This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2022 at 11:31:22 (UTC).

MILFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY VS 1-800MEDIVAN INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 MILFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against 1-800MEDIVAN INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0762

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

1-800MEDIVAN INC.

SOUTH COAST MEDICAL TRANSPORTATION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIRES TIMOTHY CARL

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/24/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/24/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Complaint - Complaint

11/24/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • Hearing11/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Milford Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: South Coast Medical Transportation Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/30/2021; Service Cost: 100.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Milford Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: 1-800Medivan Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/30/2021; Service Cost: 100.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Milford Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: 1-800Medivan Inc. (Defendant); South Coast Medical Transportation Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Milford Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: 1-800Medivan Inc. (Defendant); South Coast Medical Transportation Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Milford Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: 1-800Medivan Inc. (Defendant); South Coast Medical Transportation Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Milford Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTH COAST MEDICAL TRANSPORTATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIRES TIMOTHY CARL