This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/23/2021 at 07:15:31 (UTC).

MIDWAY RENT A CAR, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS BRYANT SAMS

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 MIDWAY RENT A CAR, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BRYANT SAMS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6521

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDWAY RENT A CAR INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA MIDWAY CAR RENTAL DBA M CAR DBA MIDWAY HFCA LLC

Defendant

SAMS BRYANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

9/8/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/8/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

9/8/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Complaint - Complaint

9/8/2021: Complaint - Complaint

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

9/8/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

9/28/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/17/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

11/12/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/9/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

11/3/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/3/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2024
  • Hearing09/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • Hearing03/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Midway Rent a Car, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Bryant Sams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Bryant Sams; On the Complaint filed by Midway Rent a Car, Inc., a California Corporation on 09/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Midway Rent a Car, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Bryant Sams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • Docket; Default not entered as to Bryant Sams; On the Complaint filed by Midway Rent a Car, Inc., a California Corporation on 09/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Midway Rent a Car, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Bryant Sams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Midway Rent a Car, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Bryant Sams (Defendant); Mailing Date: 09/25/2021; Service Cost: 55.00; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Midway Rent a Car, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Midway Rent a Car, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Bryant Sams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Midway Rent a Car, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Bryant Sams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIDWAY RENT A CAR INC. is a litigant