This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2021 at 17:38:14 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS JORDEN LUCERO

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JORDEN LUCERO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT R. HERIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7989

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT R. HERIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

LUCERO JORDEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAHN MICHAEL D

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

8/9/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/29/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

7/29/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

7/29/2021: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

7/29/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2022
  • Hearing08/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JORDEN LUCERO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JORDEN LUCERO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JORDEN LUCERO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JORDEN LUCERO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 08/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Scott R. Herin in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX, A.P.C. - MICHAEL D. KAHN