This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/09/2022 at 06:07:18 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. VS RONI DERSARKISSIAN

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RONI DERSARKISSIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1091

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendant

DERSARKISSIAN RONI

Burbank, CA 91504-1121

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAGLIO-RUIZ ABRIL F

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/13/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

1/13/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Complaint - Complaint

1/13/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/13/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/21/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2023
  • Hearing01/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. (Plaintiff); As to: RONI DERSARKISSIAN (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/21/2022; Service Cost: 66.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. (Plaintiff); As to: RONI DERSARKISSIAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. (Plaintiff); As to: RONI DERSARKISSIAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. (Plaintiff); As to: RONI DERSARKISSIAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Abril F. Saglio-Ruiz