This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 22:47:52 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. VS MOISES REYNOSO

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MOISES REYNOSO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT R. HERIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7779

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT R. HERIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendant

REYNOSO MOISES

Norwalk, CA 90650

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIGORYAN MELINE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/14/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

10/14/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

10/14/2021: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

10/14/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • Hearing10/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Midland Credit Management Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: MOISES REYNOSO (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/28/2021; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Scott R. Herin in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Midland Credit Management Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: MOISES REYNOSO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Midland Credit Management Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: MOISES REYNOSO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: Midland Credit Management Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: MOISES REYNOSO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Midland Credit Management Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: MOISES REYNOSO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meline Grigoryan