This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2021 at 01:58:39 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. VS KARY F JUGGERT

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KARY F JUGGERT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDREW C. KIM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0695

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANDREW C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendant

JUGGERT KARY F

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERK CAMRYN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service (Amended)

8/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service (Amended)

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5/24/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/24/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

5/24/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

5/24/2021: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • Hearing05/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (Amended); Filed by: Midland Credit Management Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Kary F Juggert (Defendant); Service Date: 05/30/2021; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Midland Credit Management Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Kary F Juggert (Defendant); Service Date: 05/30/2021; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Midland Credit Management Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Kary F Juggert (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Midland Credit Management Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Kary F Juggert (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Midland Credit Management Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Kary F Juggert (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: Midland Credit Management Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Kary F Juggert (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Andrew C. Kim in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERK CAMRYN