This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2022 at 07:12:43 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. VS DOMINIQUE CRAMER

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DOMINIQUE CRAMER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDREW C. KIM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7335

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANDREW C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendant

CRAMER DOMINIQUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRAVES MISHAELA J

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/8/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

3/2/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/2/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/2/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

3/2/2021: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

5/13/2021: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/7/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

5/7/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/7/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033

5/7/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. on 03/02/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Midland Credit Management Inc., does 1-10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. on 03/02/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Midland Credit Management Inc., does 1-10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Midland Credit Management Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: DOMINIQUE CRAMER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Midland Credit Management Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033; Filed by: Midland Credit Management Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to DOMINIQUE CRAMER; On the Complaint filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. on 03/02/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Midland Credit Management Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: DOMINIQUE CRAMER (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/08/2021; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Midland Credit Management Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: DOMINIQUE CRAMER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Midland Credit Management Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: DOMINIQUE CRAMER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Midland Credit Management Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: DOMINIQUE CRAMER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: Midland Credit Management Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: DOMINIQUE CRAMER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Andrew C. Kim in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MISHAELA J GRAVES