This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 21:47:41 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. VS BRET YOUNG

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRET YOUNG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6734

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendant

YOUNG BRET

Sherman Oaks, CA 91423

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIGORYAN MELINE

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

10/14/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

10/14/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/14/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

10/14/2021: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • Hearing10/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Midland Credit Management Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: BRET YOUNG (Defendant); Service Date: 10/25/2021; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Midland Credit Management Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: BRET YOUNG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Midland Credit Management Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: BRET YOUNG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: Midland Credit Management Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: BRET YOUNG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Midland Credit Management Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: BRET YOUNG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meline Grigoryan