This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 04:33:16 (UTC).

MIDLAND CONTRACTORS, INC. VS MASSIMO BORGESE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 MIDLAND CONTRACTORS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MASSIMO BORGESE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7181

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CONTRACTORS INC.

Defendants

BORGESE MASSIMO DBA BORGESE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

PALISADES CAPITAL FUND 7 LLC

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

BORGESE CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAIN BETTY STASZEK

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

10/1/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

10/1/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

10/1/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/1/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

10/1/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/26/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/22/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/22/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/22/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/26/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2024
  • Hearing10/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • Hearing04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketAddress for Betty Staszek Chain (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: MIDLAND CONTRACTORS, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: BORGESE CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by MIDLAND CONTRACTORS, INC. on 10/01/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by MIDLAND CONTRACTORS, INC. as to MASSIMO BORGESE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: MIDLAND CONTRACTORS, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/14/2021; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: MIDLAND CONTRACTORS, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: MASSIMO BORGESE (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/19/2021; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: MIDLAND CONTRACTORS, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: PALISADES CAPITAL FUND 7 LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/19/2021; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MIDLAND CONTRACTORS, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: MASSIMO BORGESE (Defendant); PALISADES CAPITAL FUND 7 LLC (Defendant); AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MIDLAND CONTRACTORS, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: MASSIMO BORGESE (Defendant); PALISADES CAPITAL FUND 7 LLC (Defendant); AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MIDLAND CONTRACTORS, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: MASSIMO BORGESE (Defendant); PALISADES CAPITAL FUND 7 LLC (Defendant); AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIDLAND CONTRACTORS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAIN BETTY STASZEK ESQ.