This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2022 at 05:22:01 (UTC).

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY VS NJC ENTERPRISE INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NJC ENTERPRISE INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NICHOLAS F. DAUM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0334

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

NICHOLAS F. DAUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

NJC ENTERPRISE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA NJC ENTERPRISE INC DBA XTREME AUTO SPORTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HETTENA ALEXANDER V

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5/19/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

5/19/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/19/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/8/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2023
  • Hearing05/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: NJC ENTERPRISE INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/01/2022; Service Cost: 99.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: NJC ENTERPRISE INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: NJC ENTERPRISE INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: NJC ENTERPRISE INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Nicholas F. Daum in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HETTENA ALEXANDER V