This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2023 at 03:12:27 (UTC).

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY VS CHETRA PAK

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHETRA PAK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7990

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

PAK CHETRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENSON SUSAN M.

Defendant Attorney

MESHKINFAM SANAZ

 

Court Documents

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

11/30/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/30/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/30/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

11/30/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

11/30/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/30/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/9/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

1/9/2023: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - Answer

1/9/2023: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2025
  • Hearing12/03/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2024
  • Hearing05/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Chetra Pak (Defendant); As to: Mid-Century Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Chetra Pak (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Chetra Pak (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Mid-Century Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Chetra Pak (Defendant); Service Date: 12/10/2022; Service Cost: 69.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/03/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mid-Century Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Chetra Pak (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Mid-Century Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Chetra Pak (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mid-Century Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Chetra Pak (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MESHKINFAM SANAZ