This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/03/2021 at 04:44:33 (UTC).

MICHAEL TAMOLA, ET AL. VS VU PHAM

Case Summary

On 09/23/2021 MICHAEL TAMOLA filed an Other lawsuit against VU PHAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3152

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Petitioners

TAMOLA MICHAEL

SCHILLHORN ANITA

Respondent

PHAM VU AKA VU HOANG PHAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LOVETT STEVEN R.

 

Court Documents

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

9/23/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

9/23/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Petition (name extension) - Petition For Decree to Release Property from Mechanic's Lien

9/23/2021: Petition (name extension) - Petition For Decree to Release Property from Mechanic's Lien

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

9/23/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

9/23/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/14/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • Hearing01/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Petition (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Michael Tamola (Petitioner); Anita Schillhorn (Petitioner); As to: Vu Pham (Respondent); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/08/2021; Service Cost: 90.46; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketPetition For Decree to Release Property from Mechanic's Lien; Filed by: Michael Tamola (Petitioner); Anita Schillhorn (Petitioner); As to: Vu Pham (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Michael Tamola (Petitioner); Anita Schillhorn (Petitioner); As to: Vu Pham (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition For Decree to Release Property from Mechanic's Lien scheduled for 01/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVETT STEVEN R.