This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2022 at 03:49:42 (UTC).

MICHAEL BABADOSTOV VS AMERICAN EXPRESS COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/08/2022 MICHAEL BABADOSTOV filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AMERICAN EXPRESS COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1860

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BABADOSTOV MICHAEL DBA STANDS ONLINE

Defendant

AMERICAN EXPRESS COMPANY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

9/8/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

9/8/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

9/8/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

9/8/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)]

10/4/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)]

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/3/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

9/26/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

9/26/2022: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

10/11/2022: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

10/11/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/13/2022

10/13/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/13/2022

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/13/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/13/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by MICHAEL BABADOSTOV on 09/08/2022, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: MICHAEL BABADOSTOV (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: MICHAEL BABADOSTOV (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN EXPRESS COMPANY (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 09/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: MICHAEL BABADOSTOV (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name); Filed by: MICHAEL BABADOSTOV (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN EXPRESS COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name)]; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS AMEX BANK is a litigant