This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2022 at 12:21:02 (UTC).

METRO ATM, INCORPORATED, VS S.S. MULTANI, INC. DBA CENTRO MERCADO LATINO AND DOES 1-50, INCLUSIVE,

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 METRO ATM, INCORPORATED filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against S S MULTANI, INC DBA CENTRO MERCADO LATINO AND DOES 1-50, INCLUSIVE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7803

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

METRO ATM INCORPORATED

Defendants

S.S. MULTANI INC. DBA CENTRO MERCADO LATINO AND DOES 1-50 INCLUSIVE

SINGH PARAMJIT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONTI ALEXANDER L

Defendant Attorney

KNAUSS JOANNE MIRRAS

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

10/12/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

10/12/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/12/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint (1st)

11/18/2021: Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint (1st)

Answer - Answer

3/14/2022: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2022
  • Hearing10/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: S.S. MULTANI, INC. dba CENTRO MERCADO LATINO and DOES 1-50, inclusive, (Defendant); Paramjit Singh (Defendant); As to: METRO ATM, INCORPORATED, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 10/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: METRO ATM, INCORPORATED, (Plaintiff); As to: S.S. MULTANI, INC. dba CENTRO MERCADO LATINO and DOES 1-50, inclusive, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: METRO ATM, INCORPORATED, (Plaintiff); As to: S.S. MULTANI, INC. dba CENTRO MERCADO LATINO and DOES 1-50, inclusive, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: METRO ATM, INCORPORATED, (Plaintiff); As to: S.S. MULTANI, INC. dba CENTRO MERCADO LATINO and DOES 1-50, inclusive, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: METRO ATM, INCORPORATED, (Plaintiff); As to: S.S. MULTANI, INC. dba CENTRO MERCADO LATINO and DOES 1-50, inclusive, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where METRO ATM INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KNAUSS JOANNE MIRRAS