This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 16:16:17 (UTC).

METIS LAW GROUP, LLP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP VS INTERVENTIONAL SPINE CARE & ORTHOPEDIC REGENERATIVE EXPERTS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 METIS LAW GROUP, LLP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP filed an Other lawsuit against INTERVENTIONAL SPINE CARE ORTHOPEDIC REGENERATIVE EXPERTS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4110

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

METIS LAW GROUP LLP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

MORADIAN MAXIM

CHANG JOCELYN

INTERVENTIONAL SPINE CARE & ORTHOPEDIC REGENERATIVE EXPERTS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

INTERVENTIONAL SPINE CARE & ORTHOPEDIC REGENERATIVE EXPERTS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Cross Defendant and Defendant

CHANG JOCELYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AIVAZI ZHANA ESQ.

AVANESSIAN ARPA ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

ACKERMAN WHITNEY D.

LEVINE ZACHARY

AIVAZI ZHANA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

5/26/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

5/26/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/26/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

8/2/2021: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Answer - Answer

8/2/2021: Answer - Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case) of 08/31/2021

8/31/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case) of 08/31/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case) of 08/31/2021

8/31/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case) of 08/31/2021

Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

8/25/2021: Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

9/23/2021: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Answer - Answer

9/23/2021: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2024
  • Hearing05/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • Hearing11/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Jocelyn Chang (Defendant); As to: Metis Law Group, LLP, a California limited liability partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Jocelyn Chang (Defendant); As to: INTERVENTIONAL SPINE CARE & ORTHOPEDIC REGENERATIVE EXPERTS, a California Corporation (Defendant); Maxim Moradian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Not Related

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case) of 08/31/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case) of 08/31/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Zhana Aivazi (Attorney): Name Suffix: blank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: INTERVENTIONAL SPINE CARE & ORTHOPEDIC REGENERATIVE EXPERTS, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: INTERVENTIONAL SPINE CARE & ORTHOPEDIC REGENERATIVE EXPERTS, a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: Jocelyn Chang (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Metis Law Group, LLP, a California limited liability partnership (Plaintiff); As to: INTERVENTIONAL SPINE CARE & ORTHOPEDIC REGENERATIVE EXPERTS, a California Corporation (Defendant); Jocelyn Chang (Defendant); Maxim Moradian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Metis Law Group, LLP, a California limited liability partnership (Plaintiff); As to: INTERVENTIONAL SPINE CARE & ORTHOPEDIC REGENERATIVE EXPERTS, a California Corporation (Defendant); Jocelyn Chang (Defendant); Maxim Moradian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Metis Law Group, LLP, a California limited liability partnership (Plaintiff); As to: INTERVENTIONAL SPINE CARE & ORTHOPEDIC REGENERATIVE EXPERTS, a California Corporation (Defendant); Jocelyn Chang (Defendant); Maxim Moradian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERVENTIONAL SPINE CARE AND ORTHOPEDIC REGENERATIVE EXPERTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AVANESSIAN ARPA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIVAZI ZHANA