This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 07:02:25 (UTC).

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY VS REMI CAMA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against REMI CAMA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6566

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

CAMA REMI

CAMA MARJORIE T.

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THAI MIN NHU

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

9/9/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

9/9/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

9/9/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/9/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

9/9/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

11/16/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/16/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/16/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

11/10/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/10/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

11/10/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2024
  • Hearing09/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • Hearing03/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Remi Cama (Defendant); Marjorie T. Cama (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Mercury Insurance Company on 09/09/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Mercury Insurance Company, does 1-50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Remi Cama (Defendant); Marjorie T. Cama (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Marjorie T. Cama (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Remi Cama (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Marjorie T. Cama; Remi Cama; On the Complaint filed by Mercury Insurance Company on 09/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Remi Cama (Defendant); Marjorie T. Cama (Defendant); 1 to 50 DOES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Remi Cama (Defendant); Marjorie T. Cama (Defendant); 1 to 50 DOES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Remi Cama (Defendant); Marjorie T. Cama (Defendant); 1 to 50 DOES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THAI MIN NHU