This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2023 at 10:06:24 (UTC).

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY VS JOSEPH BLACKWELL

Case Summary

On 03/21/2023 MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOSEPH BLACKWELL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1860

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

BLACKWELL JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THAI MIN NHU

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/21/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

3/21/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/21/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/21/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/21/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

3/21/2023: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

3/21/2023: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

3/21/2023: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2026
  • Hearing03/24/2026 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2024
  • Hearing09/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph Blackwell (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/24/2026 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph Blackwell (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph Blackwell (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph Blackwell (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less