This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2022 at 14:23:55 (UTC).

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY VS ANA X. ESCALANTE

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANA X ESCALANTE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7312

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

ESCALANTE ANA X.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THAI MIN NHU

Defendant Attorney

KIM CHRISTINA E.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

10/7/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

10/7/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Complaint - Complaint

10/7/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/7/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

10/7/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Order on Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures - Order on Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures

11/18/2021: Order on Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures - Order on Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures

Answer - Answer

11/9/2021: Answer - Answer

Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures - Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures

11/9/2021: Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures - Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

11/9/2021: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/9/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2023
  • Hearing04/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures: Filed By: Ana X. Escalante (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 11/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Order on Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures: Status Date changed from 11/18/2021 to 11/18/2021; Status changed from TP to Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketOrder on Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures; TP by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 04/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Type changed from Non-Jury Trial to Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 11/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Ana X. Escalante (Defendant); As to: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketRequest to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures; Filed by: Ana X. Escalante (Defendant); As to: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Ana X. Escalante (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Ana X. Escalante (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Ana X. Escalante (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Ana X. Escalante (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Ana X. Escalante (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM, CHRISTINA E