This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/24/2023 at 13:10:39 (UTC).

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION VS J MARTIN ESTRADA

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against J MARTIN ESTRADA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0283

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

Defendant

ESTRADA J MARTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAINES TODD F.

 

Court Documents

Summons Summons on Complaint

1/13/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpr

1/13/2023: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpr

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/13/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order Third Amended Standing Order

1/13/2023: Third Amended Standing Order Third Amended Standing Order

Complaint

1/13/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/13/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

1/13/2023: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/23/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2026
  • Hearing01/16/2026 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2024
  • Hearing07/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: J MARTIN ESTRADA (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/04/2023; Service Cost: 80.98; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: J MARTIN ESTRADA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: J MARTIN ESTRADA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: J MARTIN ESTRADA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/16/2026 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less