This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2021 at 08:27:47 (UTC).

MARY MOSTAFAVI VS STARBUCKS CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 MARY MOSTAFAVI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STARBUCKS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0994

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOSTAFAVI MARY

Defendant

STARBUCKS CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/27/2021

7/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/27/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/27/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

6/25/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

6/25/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/25/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6/25/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/27/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Mary Mostafavi on 06/25/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result Date changed from 06/29/2021 to 06/29/2021; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Mary Mostafavi (Plaintiff); As to: Starbucks Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Mary Mostafavi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Mary Mostafavi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Starbucks Corp is a litigant