This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/27/2022 at 18:46:48 (UTC).

MARTIN STRASBUGER VS ORBITZ LLC

Case Summary

On 07/23/2021 MARTIN STRASBUGER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ORBITZ LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DOUGLAS W. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0662

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DOUGLAS W. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STRASBUGER MARTIN

Defendant

ORBITZ LLC AKA ORBITZ WORLDWIDE LLC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

7/23/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Certificate of Mailing - Certificate of Mailing

7/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing - Certificate of Mailing

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

7/23/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

8/2/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/23/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/16/2021

9/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/16/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

9/16/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

9/15/2021: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

9/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Martin Strasbuger on 07/23/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/16/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13 updated: Result Date to 09/16/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Martin Strasbuger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Martin Strasbuger (Plaintiff); As to: Orbitz LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 07/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Martin Strasbuger (Plaintiff); As to: Orbitz LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Douglas W. Stern in Department S13 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Orbitz LLC (Defendant) to Orbitz LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Orbitz LLC (Defendant) to Orbitz LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ORBITZ is a litigant